Financial history SAWMILLS VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 520543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £9.91k £24.46k £8.76k £10.32k £12.03k
Total expenditure £4.69k £8.64k £10.24k £10.67k £6.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.17k N/A £100 £500