Eton Wick Youth and Community

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help young people in the Eton Wick, Berkshire, and surrounding area through the provision of recreational and leisure time activities provided in the interest of social welfare, designed to improve their conditions of life. Develop their skills, capacities, and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as individuals. To support residents and community members of Eton Wick.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 07 December 2022: CIO registration
- Eton Wick Village Group (Working name)
- Eton Wick Waterways Group (Working name)
- THE WICK (Working name)
- ETON WICK YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dawn Sarah Kane | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Ludovici | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Hill | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Regazzacci | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Branscombe-Davies | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Dec 2022 as amended on 25 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE ETON WICK, BERKSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ground Floor
Village Hall
1 Eton Wick Road
ETON WICK
WINDSOR
- Phone:
- 07764821130
- Email:
- ewyc-cio@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window