HEANOR MINERS' WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of an institute and recreational facilities for the benefit of the community of Heanor, including Bowls, Football, Long Alley Skittles,Pool, Darts, Dominoes. Dementia tea dance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 09 July 1964: Standard registration
- HEANOR MINERS WELFARE (Working name)
- HEANOR MINERS' WELFARE RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL BEER | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
MR PHIL RIMMINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN HENRY MARSHALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN REYNOLDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.77k | £115.13k | £210.53k | £239.50k | £257.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.83k | £119.48k | £231.79k | £250.67k | £255.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £22.00k | £26.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.00k | £26.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2024
(These accounts |
08 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
08 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
07 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 21ST JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION OF AN INSTITUTE AND RECREATIONAL FACILITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS (AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOR EXCLUSIVELY, SUCH OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS ARE MEMBERS OF THE MINING COMMUNITY) OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HEANOR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 ILKESTON ROAD
HEANOR
DE75 7DT
- Phone:
- 01773712062
- Email:
- hmwt1925@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window