ARKWRIGHT MEMORIAL HALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of the ecclesiastical parish of St Michael, Holbrook, Derbyshire without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, for meetings, lectures and classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation. The furtherance of the religious and other charitable work of the Church of England in the same parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 14 August 1963: Standard registration
- 14 October 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192 | £192 | £260 | £220 | £65 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £382 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 13 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 29 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 19 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 9 AUGUST 1934 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE 19 MARCH 1979
Charitable objects
(1) THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (2) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLBROOK, ST. MICHAEL.
Area of benefit
PARISH HOLBROOK ECCLESIASTICAL PAR OF ST. MICHAEL HOLBROOK.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window