HERSHAM BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a church committed to following Jesus Christ by loving God and loving others. We gather together as a church on Sunday mornings to worship God, to pray, to learn from the Bible and to spend time together. Our worship service meets at 10 am in Cardinal Newman School hall (KT12 4QT). We are a church for all ages, with a thriving children's church running each week. Anyone is welcome to join
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
54 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 12 September 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bill Chin | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Forster | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Fellows | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hinde | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 February 2025 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 February 2025 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE:- THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HERSHAM BAPTIST CHURCH
ARCH ROAD
HERSHAM
SURREY
KT12 4QR
- Phone:
- 01932701139
- Email:
- office@hershambaptist.org.uk
- Website:
-
hershambaptist.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window