AXHOLME CAT RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides help in the local community to those people needing to re-home their cats, taking in stray cats handed in to the vets or roaming in the local community, and for those looking to adopt a cat. We also run a trap, neuter, return scheme for feral cats located in the area. We have referred to the guidance contained in the charity commission's general guidance on public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Doncaster
- Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 06 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Lindy Nahmad-Williams | Chair | 18 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jonathan Gleadell | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Isabella Anne Gleadell | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Skye May | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Reed-Lawson | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Winston Williams | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CATS AND KITTENS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION IN AREAS OF SOUTH YORKSHIRE, NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE AND LINCOLNSHIRE, IN PARTICULAR, BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING RESCUE HOMES AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE, TREATMENT AND REHOMING OF SUCH ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MEDLEY HOUSE FARM
CARRHOUSE ROAD
BELTON
DONCASTER
DN9 1PG
- Phone:
- 07368583608
- Email:
- AXHOLMECATRESCUE@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window