EAST VALE MINISTRY AREA

Charity number: 1200840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Generally advancing the Christian religion through provision of buildings as places of worship, pastoral care and outreach

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £151,735
Total expenditure: £158,746

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Vale Of Glamorgan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 October 2022: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Diana Jean Powell Trustee 29 April 2024
None on record
Judith Tiffany Morris Trustee 29 April 2024
None on record
Martyn Haydn Evans Trustee 29 April 2024
None on record
Dr Alexandra Rees Trustee 27 November 2023
None on record
Rev Peter Begbie Watson Trustee 29 June 2023
None on record
Katherine Audrey Kemp Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Rev Amanda Thomas Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Margaret Delyth Hurley Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
Rev Stephen Michael John Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
Dr Elizabeth Jane Warner Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
Judith Elizabeth Roberts Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
Lynne Christine Mordecai Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
Gethin Rowlands Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
Alan David Meredith Trustee 25 April 2022
WELSH RUGBY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Anna Cory Trustee 25 April 2022
THE LLANDAFF DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
MAECYMRU MERCHED A'R EGLWYS
Received: On time
Rev MARTYN JOHN DAVIES Trustee 25 April 2022
PETERSTON CHURCH AND COMMUNITY HALL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023
Total gross income £151.74k
Total expenditure £158.75k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Rectory
Peterston-super-Ely
CARDIFF
CF5 6LH
Phone:
01446760498