Financial history SEAHAM UNIT 299 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 520569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.96k £14.40k £17.50k £44.55k £45.91k
Total expenditure £10.05k £5.90k £11.89k £40.83k £59.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £1.00k £1.10k £1.20k
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £2.67k £600 £5.44k