CURE AND ACTION FOR TAY-SACHS (CATS) FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CATS Foundation operates in England and Wales and supports families affected by Tay-Sachs and Sandhoff disease. We provide equipment that affected patients need, respite holidays, a support network for patients and their families and information on care, emotional support and research development. The charity also supports research into a possible cure for these devastating diseases.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 October 2022: CIO registration
- 11 July 2023: Funds received from 1144543 CURE AND ACTION FOR TAY-SACHS (CATS) FOUNDATION
- CATS FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL PHILIP RALPH HOW | Chair | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shara Choudhury | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tomos Llywelyn ap Gwilym | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN RACHEL LEWI | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG SUFFERERS OF TAY-SACHS AND SANDHOFF BY: A) SUPPORTING RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INTO THE CAUSES, PREVENTION, DIAGNOSIS AND METHODS OF TREATMENT OF TAY-SACHS AND SANDHOFF AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH; B) PROVISION OF A SUPPORT NETWORK FOR FAMILIES SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF TAY-SACHS AND SANDHOFF INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, PROVISION OF RESPITE HOLIDAYS FOR SUFFERERS AND THEIR CARERS; C) THE PURCHASE OF EQUIPMENT NOT AVAILABLE ON THE NHS TO ALLEVIATE SUFFERING AND IMPROVE CONDITIONS OF LIFE; D) FINANCING TRIPS AT HOME OR OVERSEAS FOR TREATMENT IF AND WHEN AN EFFECTIVE AND LICENSED TREATMENT IS FOUND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUITE 3
PEEL HOUSE
30 THE DOWNS
ALTRINCHAM
WA14 2PX
- Phone:
- 07894859752
- Email:
- INFO@CATS-FOUNDATION.ORG
- Website:
-
WWW.CATS-FOUNDATION.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window