SHADFORTH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To manage the Village Hall for the use of residents without distinction of sex or of political, religious or other opinions, and in particular for use for meetings, lectures and classes, and other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £12,098 from 8 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 02 September 1964: Standard registration
- SHADFORTH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Pringle | Chair | 10 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Stewart Edward Skelton | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Edmund Chalder-Wood | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Farren | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Emma Priest | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Frances Ridgway | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Wallace | Trustee | 10 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Karen Anne Chalkley | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Trudy Marsali Barr | Trustee | 20 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mary Warburton | Trustee | 20 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.18k | £12.09k | £20.88k | £42.74k | £24.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.98k | £13.88k | £13.55k | £47.28k | £15.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.16k | £7.20k | £2.86k | £20.51k | £12.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED AS AMENDED 8 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SHADFORTH AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
South Side
Shadforth
DURHAM
DH6 1LL
- Phone:
- 07946779140
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window