COLWALL YOUTH PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth work within Worcestershire and Herefordshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 13 October 2022: CIO registration
- CYP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elinor Gillen | Chair | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maechelle Bowring | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Colville | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Gillen | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Robinson | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary Lloyd | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
FREDA MARY BALLARD BA | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Philip King | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, AGED 10-18 WHO LIVE IN OR NEAR COLWALL, HEREFORDSHIRE, THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Colwall Community Church
Walwyn Rd
Colwall
Herefordshire
WR13 6QG
- Phone:
- 07925275769
- Email:
- alice@thecyp.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window