VISIBLE RECOVERY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Visible Recovery educates legislators, health professionals, criminal justice professionals, academics, spiritual leaders, and others who come into contact with suffering addicts. We highlight the benefits offered to the public from 12 Step recovery available worldwide. One of the ways we do this is by holding Recovery Fairs.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 January 2023: Standard registration
- APPG FOR 12 STEPS RECOVERY SECRETARIAT LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cian Duggan | Chair | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas George Kohler MA. FCA | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fraser Robert McIntyre BCom, CA | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 50 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 50 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 MAY 2022 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 06 JAN 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION AND RECOVERY, AND TO PROMOTE GOOD MENTAL HEALTH, AMONG THOSE SUFFERING FROM ADDICTION, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS AMONG LEGISLATORS, HEALTH PROFESSIONALS, POLICE, CRIMINAL JUSTICE PROFESSIONALS, ACADEMICS, TEACHERS, SPIRITUAL LEADERS, CULTURAL ORGANISATIONS AND OTHERS IN THE UK AND WORLDWIDE WHO COME INTO CONTACT WITH SUFFERING ADDICTS SO THEY MAY BETTER UNDERSTAND THE BENEFITS ON OFFER TO THEIR CLIENTS (THE PUBLIC) FROM THE MANY 12 STEP RECOVERY PROGRAMMES AVAILABLE IN THE UK AND WORLDWIDE. B) PROVIDING THE PUBLIC WITH INFORMATION AND ADVICE THAT WILL SUPPORT THEM INTO 12 STEP RECOVERY PROGRAMMES, RAISE AWARENESS ABOUT THE IMPORTANCE OF SPIRITUALITY FOR HEALING FROM ADDICTION AND OTHER MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES AND ALLOW THEM TO RECOVER FROM MULTIPLE ADDICTIONS AND STAY RECOVERED. C) SUPPORTING RESEARCH PROJECTS WHICH COVER THE 12 STEP RECOVERY PROGRAMMES AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH TO THE PUBLIC, POLICY MAKERS, AND MANAGERS OF SERVICE PROVIDERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tara
Gold Hill
Lower Bourne
FARNHAM
Surrey
GU103JH
- Phone:
- 07765847445
- Email:
- zoe@visiblerecovery.uk
- Website:
-
visiblerecovery.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window