TRINITY HOUSE SOCIAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Voluntary organisation & registered charity that operates as a community centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 24 June 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Carr | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.00k | £71.94k | £32.29k | £88.71k | £145.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.62k | £84.64k | £43.50k | £99.75k | £150.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 April 2024 | 435 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 April 2024 | 435 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 April 2024 | 795 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 April 2024 | 795 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 156 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 10 OCTOBER 1977
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTH SHIELDS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SOUTH SHEILDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRINITY HOUSE SOCIAL CENTRE
134 LAYGATE
SOUTH SHIELDS
NE33 4JD
- Phone:
- 0191 454 3972
- Email:
- trinityhousesc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window