Accounts and annual returns EASTGATE VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 520587
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 April 2025 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 April 2025 434 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 March 2022 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required