Financial history EASTGATE VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 520587
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.27k £23.52k £16.25k £43.43k £15.25k
Total expenditure £15.92k £4.85k £5.43k £43.08k £26.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £23.24k £14.67k £2.09k £1.00k