Trustees WAKEFIELD AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR DEAF PEOPLE

Charity number: 1201337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Evans Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
Marie Vickers Trustee 03 October 2023
None on record
Ann Stokes Trustee 03 October 2023
None on record
Valerie Pratt Trustee 13 March 2023
None on record
Michael Madden Trustee 14 November 2022
None on record
Frank Wood Trustee 14 November 2022
None on record
John Pearson Trustee 26 September 2022
None on record
RICHARD JONES Trustee 26 September 2022
None on record