DAMBA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of Damba Foundation is to provide assistance to needy families and individuals to pay for food, medical expenses & school fees. We primarily operate in the Indian Subcontinent & parts of Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bangladesh
- India
- Pakistan
- South Africa
- Tanzania
Governance
- 03 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kamrunnisa Khan | Chair | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Atif Khan Deshmukh | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sabia Mir | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adil Khan Deshmukh | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.20k | £13.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.90k | £13.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES (INCLUDING AND NOT EXCLUSIVE TO INDIA, SOUTH AFRICA, TANZANIA) BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Guildford Street
Staines-upon-Thames
TW18 2EQ
- Phone:
- 01784460663
- Email:
- dambafoundationgb@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window