THEA AND HEINZ SKYTE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to promote, sustain and increase access to education, knowledge and skills to those who without financial assistance may be denied access, and to increase social mobility by enabling future potential to be realised,through the provision of grants primarily but not exclusively in the inner north Leeds area. .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leeds City
Governance
- 16 November 2022: CIO registration
- SKYTE CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- Skyte Trust (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Abigail Thornton | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Blackman | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mahalia France-Mir | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason Andrew Gay | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fabian Nino Uziell Hamilton | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Hamilton | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Simon Myerson | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Jason Karl Pitter | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Paul Skyte | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter David Skyte | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel John Skyte | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN LEEDS: A. THE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY MAKING GRANTS FOR EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND B. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVISION OF GRANT FUNDING FOR EDUCATION AND TRAINING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 MAYFIELD AVENUE
LONDON
N12 9JG
- Phone:
- 07768931302
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window