ALDERHOLT CHAPEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday - services AM & PM , with break out kids groups & creche Wednesday - Bible study groups Thursday - Tiddlywinks - A parent and toddlers group Friday - Amicus - A division of The Boy's Brigade for young people. Monthly "clubs" - Carers Cafe (support group for carers) / Craft club Weddings, Funerals & maintenance of Graveyard
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 23 May 2023: Standard registration
- ALDERHOLT CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Curtis | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Desmond Johnston | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Norman Bale | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Charles Tomsett | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 JUN 2022 as amended on 22 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
2.1 THE OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE FUNDAMENTAL TRUTHS OF CHRISTIANITY AS REVEALED IN THE BIBLE ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF EFCC FELLOWSHIP AS SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH AND THE POSITION STATEMENTS (THE "EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH"). 2.2 THE CHURCH MAY ALSO FURTHER ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES THAT SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHURCH. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES MUST NOT CONFLICT WITH THE PRIMARY AIM OF ADVANCING THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALDERHOLT CHAPEL
3-5 HILLBURY ROAD
ALDERHOLT
FORDINGBRIDGE
SP6 3BQ
- Phone:
- 01425655155
- Email:
- office@alderholtchapel.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window