INDEPENDENT CAT RESCUE PRESTWICH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a small team of unpaid volunteers who provide and maintain facilities for the care and treatment of lost and injured cats. We return lost cats to their owners or rehome them. We raise funds and provide medical treatment for sick and injured cats. We spay and neuter all cats, including feral colonies. We have an active Facebook group of over 4,000 members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bury
Governance
- 06 January 2023: Standard registration
- 12 January 2024: Funds received from 1139170 BOLTON & BURY CAT RESCUE
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Franks | Chair | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Elizabeth Vickerstaff | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Stewart | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ashlea Franks | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Jenkins | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Boswell | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 OCT 2022 AS AMENDED ON 17 DEC 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CATS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION IN PRESTWICH AND, IN PARTICULAR: *PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING RESCUE HOME OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF CATS; *ACTIVELY WORKING TO RETURN LOST CATS TO THEIR OWNERS, WHEREVER POSSIBLE; *ACTIVELY SEEKING NEW HOMES FOR “RESCUED” CATS; *PROVIDING MEDICAL TREATMENTS FOR RESCUED CATS WHO NEED SUCH CARE AND TREATMENT AND CARRYING OUT SPAYING AND NEUTERING OF FERAL CATS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 PRESTWICH HILLS
PRESTWICH
MANCHESTER
M25 9PY
- Phone:
- 07747843734
- Email:
- icrcatrescue@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window