WOLLOW - THE WORLD OF LANGUAGES AND LANGUAGES OF THE WORLD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
'WoLLoW' is a charity set up to develop the teaching of languages in schools, not only in the United Kingdom but also internationally. It does so by working with primary and secondary schools to provide free resources which encourage not only the learning of languages but also an understanding of their significance in increasingly diverse school communities.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 January 2023: CIO registration
- WOLLOW (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abigail Dean | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Idnan Ahmad Yunas | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steffan Daniel Anderson Griffiths | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Kate Howell | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CLAUGHTON | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Kenneth Alexander Wilson | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, CHILDREN IN LANGUAGES OF THE WORLD, PAST AND PRESENT, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING: (A) MAKING MATERIALS, OR OBJECTS CAPABLE OF EDUCATING, AVAILABLE TO SCHOOLS AND THE WIDER PUBLIC; (B) PROVIDING LESSONS, SEMINARS AND LECTURES; AND (C) FOSTERING AN INTEREST IN AND APPRECIATION OF ALL LANGUAGES TO BROADEN PUPILS' CULTURAL KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORWICH SCHOOL
69-71A THE CLOSE
NORWICH
NR1 4DD
- Phone:
- 01603728430
- Email:
- johnclaughton1204@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window