GROWING HOPE GATESHEAD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Growing Hope Gateshead offers a therapy clinic for children and young people with additional needs and their families to support them in achieving their potential and to help improve their health and wellbeing in the Gateshead area. The charity aims to help anyone regardless of their religious beliefs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gateshead
Governance
- 14 February 2023: CIO registration
- 22 April 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
- 22 April 2025: Funds transferred to 263960 BENEFACT TRUST LIMITED
- 22 April 2025: Funds transferred to 1178248 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
- 22 April 2025: Funds transferred to 1176358 GROWING HOPE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND WELLBEING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF A THERAPY CLINIC RUN IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE [0-18] WITH ADDITIONAL NEEDS AND THEIR FAMILIES LIVING IN THE GATESHEAD AREA. IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: A. REGISTERED HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS PROVIDING ASSESSMENT, ADVICE AND INTERVENTION AND OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. B. PROVISION OF SIBLING, PARENT AND CARER SUPPORT GROUPS AND COURSES AND OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH: A. THE OPPORTUNITY TO ENGAGE IN CONVERSATION ABOUT FAITH AND SPIRITUAL WELLBEING; B. PROVIDING SUPPORT THAT ENABLES CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH ADDITIONAL NEEDS, AND THEIR FAMILIES TO ACCESS PRAYER AND WORSHIP SERVICES; C. PROVIDING PASTORAL CARE AND THE OPPORTUNITY FOR PRAYER AND OTHER SUCH ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT THAT ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window