THE WOMBLES COMMUNITY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the CIO are to advance the education of the public, and school aged children in the protection and improvement of the environment through free educational resources and support. The CIO will also support litter-picking groups and community-led initiatives through resources, networking and promotion to further environmental work they are doing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20937 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jolyon Berry | Chair | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lene Malthasen | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Craig Treharne | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alex Holliman | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL, INCLUDING SCHOOL AGED CHILDREN, IN THE PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT, THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES AND SUPPORT TO TEACHERS AND PARENTS; AND (B) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND RESOURCES TO LITTER-PICKING GROUPS AND OTHER COMMUNITY INITIATIVES SEEKING TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THEIR PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Worlds End Studios
132-134 Lots Road
London
SW10 0RJ
- Phone:
- 02073497119
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window