AMINGTON BAND SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 26 February 1964: Standard registration
- AMINGTON BAND MINERS WELFARE CENTRE (Working name)
- AMINGTON BAND WELFARE INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Michael Peart | Trustee | 16 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JAMES GIFFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM GREGORY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS CAROL ALBRIGHTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.39k | £12.94k | £13.01k | £10.00k | £9.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.64k | £12.04k | £15.62k | £13.08k | £11.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 204 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 204 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 570 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 570 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 935 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 935 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1300 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1300 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1665 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1665 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
A SCHEME DATED 21 OCTOBER 2004
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF WORKERS IN COAL MINES AND THEIR FAMILIES IN AND ABOUT THE BENEFICIAL AREA AS A BAND CLUB AND RECREATION CLUB.
Area of benefit
AMINGTON AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Amington Band Room
Sharpe Street
TAMWORTH
Staffordshire
B77 3HY
- Phone:
- 07710426588
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window