ROSEBIRD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To manage and operate a community centre for activities of social welfare, recreation and leisure activities for local people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 06 December 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Patricia Roberts | Chair | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Mary Wheeler | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Jackson | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil James Gardiner | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Claire Walsh | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Rolfe | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.11k | £25.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.41k | £24.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 20 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
(1) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF TRINITY MEAD AND BRIDGETOWN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. (2) TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE WITHIN THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES WITHIN TRINITY MEAD AND BRIDGETOWN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROSEBIRD COMMUNITY HALL
THE ROSEBIRD CENTRE
SHIPSTON ROAD
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
CV37 8LU
- Phone:
- 01789297787
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window