73RD DERBY (ALLESTREE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
48 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derby City
Governance
- 18 March 1964: Standard registration
- 73RD DERBY (ALLESTREE) BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Silo | Chair | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keeley Ann Rogers | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Robinson | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Webster | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kristy Seal | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ewan Peter Favell | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Josh Kawalek | Trustee | 06 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Smith | Trustee | 06 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Mary Bond | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Bond | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gareth James Mitchell | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
GERALD PRICE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.12k | £29.62k | £22.64k | £48.90k | £41.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.53k | £38.97k | £21.67k | £52.38k | £42.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £5.80k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2022
(These accounts |
30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 July 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2020
(These accounts |
19 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 20TH SEPTEMBER 1963 UPTON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
73RD DERBY (ALLESTREE) SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
ALLESTREE AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
73rd Derby (Allestree) Scout Group
Woodlands Road
Allestree
DERBY
DE22 2HE
- Phone:
- 07968861916
- Email:
- 73rdscoutswaiting@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window