Trustees 73RD DERBY (ALLESTREE) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 520628
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Silo | Chair | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keeley Ann Rogers | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Robinson | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Webster | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kristy Seal | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ewan Peter Favell | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Josh Kawalek | Trustee | 06 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Smith | Trustee | 06 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Mary Bond | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Bond | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gareth James Mitchell | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
GERALD PRICE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.