103RD DERBY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports the activities of local groups, mainly Beavers, Cubs, Scouts. Other groups includes Guides, dance classes etc. which are held in our Scout Hut in Chellaston, Derby
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derby City
Governance
- 15 April 1964: Standard registration
- 103RD DERBY BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Rawlinson | Chair | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Seagrave | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Alcock | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Dawn Ho | Trustee | 28 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Tuckwood | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Moira Tildsley | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.15k | £15.56k | £13.07k | £22.04k | £24.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.45k | £6.19k | £13.29k | £34.13k | £20.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.00k | £2.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 7TH FEBRUARY 1964 UPON THE TUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
103RD DERBY BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
DERBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scout Headquarters
Pit Close Lane
Chellaston
DERBY
DE73 6TH
- Phone:
- 07543753535
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window