GRIMSBY SHOEBOXES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We fill shoeboxes to give to children/families in Eastern Europe by other registered charities. We put in donated good condition items (clothing/toys/stationery/toiletries etc) & raise funds to buy new items. We accept filled shoeboxes. We also give shoeboxes, household items and Christmas Presents to local children/families in need. We are based at The Ice House in Victor Street, Grimsby.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 15 September 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Lepley | Chair | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Davis | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joy Walker | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Denise Johnson | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROVIDE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP/POVERTY TO PEOPLE AROUND THE WORLD BY PROVIDING BASIC ITEMS (CLOTHES, SCHOOL SUPPLIES, PERSONAL HYGIENE) TO PEOPLE WHO CANNOT AFFORD THEM. ITEMS ARE DONATED, OR MONIES RAISED USED TO BUY THESE ITEMS. THESE ITEMS ARE PROVIDED DIRECTLY TO LOCAL (LINCOLNSHIRE) PEOPLE FROM REFERRALS TO US BY REGISTERED CHARITIES (EG WOMEN'S AID) OR DISTRIBUTED ABROAD THROUGH REGISTERED CHARITIES (EG THE JACOB'S WELL APPEAL AND TEAMS4U THE CHARITY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christian Centre
Ice House
Victor Street
GRIMSBY
DN32 7QN
- Phone:
- 07904966536
- Email:
- karenshoeboxes@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window