35TH DERBY (MARKEATON) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 520632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scout Group

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £16,554
Total expenditure: £14,306

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Derby City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 January 1970: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ashley Birkinshaw Trustee 08 July 2023
DERBYSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Sarah Louise Horobin Trustee 08 July 2023
None on record
Anastasija Smirnova Trustee 08 July 2023
None on record
Heather Marie Gotheridge Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Katherine Muldal Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Gerald Whelan Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Sarah Ellen Tooze Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
David Whelan Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Joseph Peter Nuttall Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
MARK SIMPSON Trustee
None on record
WILLIAM HURST Trustee
None on record
PETER BRINSLEY HILTON Trustee
20TH DERBY (ST AUGUSTINES) BOY SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Derby Scout Shop
Received: On time
TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH DERBY GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.57k £15.46k £23.92k £15.23k £16.55k
Total expenditure £19.13k £18.33k £28.73k £10.39k £14.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.67k £16.34k £2.67k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Drum Hill Scout Camp
Morley Lane
Little Eaton
DERBY
DE21 5AH
Phone:
01332295379
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available