STAMSHAW SCHOOLS PATCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise money to put on events and provide support for Stamshaw Infant and Stamshaw Junior schools. We hold our events across both the schools and provide financial support towards school trip, vital equipment, fun activites and events, extra curricular learning opportunities and much more.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 17 January 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tanya Stevens | Chair | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keiran Joe Massey | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Pavitt | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Fancey | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chantelle Moore | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Brown | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Newell | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Michael Stevens | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Jayne Eastman | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bryony Ellis | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Bond | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 MAR 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STAMSHAW JUNIOR SCHOOL
TIPNER ROAD
PORTSMOUTH
PO2 8QH
- Phone:
- 02392661045
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window