Derby Scout Shop

Charity Number: 520641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scout Shop

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £13,484
Total expenditure: £13,266

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Derby City
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 February 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DERBY AREA SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
  • DERBY BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER BRINSLEY HILTON Trustee
35TH DERBY (MARKEATON) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH DERBY GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
20TH DERBY (ST AUGUSTINES) BOY SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
DAVID MARVIN Trustee
TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH DERBY GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.79k £4.58k £11.50k £15.16k £13.48k
Total expenditure £17.45k £4.53k £10.27k £14.18k £13.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 WHARFEDALE CLOSE
ALLESTREE
DERBY
DE22 2UQ
Phone:
01332551974
Website:

No information available