HELP 4 THE HOMELESS (LONDON AND HOME COUNTIES)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help 4 The Homeless provides food, clothing and other essential to rough sleepers in London and in the Home Counties. The Charity provides similar support to disadvantaged and poor people as part of that hands on caring service .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 October 2022: CIO registration
- HELP AND HOPE FOR THE HOMELESS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHOSHANA GILMORE | Chair | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Convisser | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marc Stephen Bennett | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annick Devillard | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.17k | £35.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.85k | £53.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE IN LONDON AND THE HOME COUNTIES WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF BEING HOMELESS, BY PROVIDING AND DISTRIBUTING FOOD, DRINK AND CLOTHING AND PROVIDING OTHER GOODS AND SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
98 STRATFIELD ROAD
BOREHAMWOOD
WD6 1XB
- Phone:
- 07976715733
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.