BRUNSWICK VOCAL ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Brunswick Vocal Arts advances the arts in England through education programmes and performances for classical singers, and through its community chorus work with singers from the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 April 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID WAKEFIELD | Chair | 14 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Carl Anthony Jackson | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Claire Barnett-Jones | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Gary Matthewman | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 OCT 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE ARTS AND EDUCATION IN ENGLAND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PERFORMING OPPORTUNITIES ALONGSIDE PROFESSIONAL MUSICIANS, PUBLIC WORKSHOPS, AND INDIVIDUAL COACHING SESSIONS, FOR CLASSICAL SINGERS, PIANISTS AND CONDUCTORS IN THE FINAL STAGES OF THEIR STUDIES AND/OR THE EARLY STAGES OF THEIR CAREERS; AND THROUGH ENGAGEMENT WITH NON-PROFESSIONAL CHORUS SINGERS FROM THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 RINGFORD ROAD
LONDON
SW18 1RP
- Phone:
- 07467544880
- Email:
- gary@brunswickvocalarts.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window