KENT AND MEDWAY NHS SOCIAL CARE PARTNERSHIP TRUST CHARITABLE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support the work of Kent and Medway NHS Social Care Partnership Trust, for any charitable purpose for the benefit of service users, carers, and staff relating to NHS service, including research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kent
Governance
- 09 March 2023: Standard registration
- HEALTH, HEART, HOPE @KMPT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kent and Medway NHS and Social Care Partnership Trust | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 FEB 2022
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF SERVICE USERS, CARERS AND STAFF RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE (INCLUDING RESEARCH), WHOLLY OR INCIDENTALLY RELATED TO THE DELIVERY OF SERVICES PROVIDED BY KENT AND MEDWAY NHS SOCIAL CARE PARTNERSHIP TRUST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KENT & MEDWAY NHS PARTNERSHIP
PRIORITY HOUSE
HERMITAGE LANE
MAIDSTONE
ME16 9PH
- Phone:
- 07707153706
- Email:
- kmpt.charity@nhs.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window