BOOMERANG'S PET FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide by way of donations and fund raising events, pet food and other necesseary items to those in financial difficulty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £860 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tanya Rudkin | Chair | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Henrietta Edwards | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Rudkin | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £860 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, BY PROVIDING PET FOOD AND OTHER ESSENTIAL PET ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 TUDOR CLOSE
HAVERHILL
CB9 8NS
- Phone:
- 07456863555
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window