YSGOL GWAUN Y NANT PTFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School Parents Teachers and Friends association planning and running fundraising events such as Christmas fayres, fun days, Quizes, mainly on the school premises to raise money for much needed items for the school children to benefit from.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 11 October 2022: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Cane | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Hoyle | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alex Rhydian Lloyd | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 October 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JUN 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
YSGOL GYMRAEG GWAUN Y NANT
AMROTH COURT
CALDY CLOSE
BARRY
CF62 9DU
- Phone:
- 01446421723
- Email:
- ygyn.pta@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window