THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST SEVENOAKS

Charity number: 1202436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Public worship and relief of poverty.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £129,285
Total expenditure: £116,435

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 March 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sewanyana Gulemye Kironde Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Mark Cheeseman Trustee 21 May 2023
THE CHILDREN'S WORKSHOP
Received: On time
Jane Maureen Moore Trustee 21 May 2023
SEVENOAKS SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
SIMON RAIKES Trustee 21 May 2023
THE SEVENOAKS SOCIETY FOR THE CONSERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE TOWN
Received: On time
Donald Philip Newholm Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Dr John William Aveson Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Michael James McGovern Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Maria Concetta Martyn Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Fr Robin Dominic Edwin Jones Trustee 25 May 2015
SOCIETY OF THE HOLY CROSS (ALSO KNOWN AS SOCIETAS SANCTAE CRUCIS)
Received: 67 days late
SEVENOAKS (LOAVES & FISHES) FOODBANK
Received: On time
Carol Ann Cheeseman Trustee 22 March 2015
None on record
GILLIAN MARIE JEANNE SHEPHERD-COATES Trustee 22 March 2015
None on record
David Scott Campbell Ashenden Trustee 20 March 2011
None on record
Graham Davison Trustee 16 September 2008
None on record
Jacqueline Hendry Trustee 01 March 1991
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023
Total gross income £129.29k
Total expenditure £116.44k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Parish Office
62 Quakers Hall Lane
Sevenoaks
Kent
TN13 3TX
Phone:
01732451710
Website:

stjtb.com