LUKE JACKSON CHARITY 1631

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides small financial help to the elderly and people with disabilities living in Bagworth, Thornton and Stanton under Bardon in Leicestershire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 23 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Wilkins | Chair | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Sarah Barnes | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Meadows | Trustee | 26 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Russell George | Trustee | 26 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr GRAHAM ALDRED | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|||||
TREVOR ROBERTS | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF THORNTON, BEING THE VILLAGES OF BAGWORTH, THORNTON AND STANTON UNDER BARDON, BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O 7 LIME GROVE
BAGWORTH
Leicestershire
LE67 1DT
- Phone:
- 01530231241
- Email:
- sandra@unitysoftware.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window