Accounts and annual returns 15TH LONG EATON SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 520666
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 10 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 10 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 26 May 2024 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 05 May 2023 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 24 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 24 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window