Trustees 15TH LONG EATON SEA SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 520666
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL HALFORD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rachael Ross | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Luther Homewood | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Catheirne Halls-Jukes | Trustee | 05 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
PHIL COLES | Trustee | 04 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN SLOWICK | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Jackie O'Donnell | Trustee | 06 June 1998 |
|
|
||||
DEBBIE PEARCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBBIE HALFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK ELM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE BUTTLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH RANDALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MURRAY PARKER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.