GOODNEWS COMMUNITY OUTREACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes Education/training The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty Other Charitable Purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Olaitan Oludayo Ogalar | Chair | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Olamigoke Olorunnisola Ifarajimi | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Adewunmi Enoch Oyeduntan | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.57k | £62.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.88k | £62.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE WEST MIDLANDS IN ENGLAND BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND SERVICES TO SUPPORT THE DEVELOPMENT OF INDIVIDUALS' CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCES, UNDERSTANDING AND SKILLS. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN WALSALL AND ENVIRONS BY PROVIDING: CARE, SUPPORT, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO PEOPLE IN NEED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GOODNEWS COMMUNITY OUTREACH
28 NEW FOREST ROAD
28 NEW FOREST ROAD
WALSALL
WS3 1TR
- Phone:
- 07533584715
- Email:
- write.gnco@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window