HCR HEWITSONS CHARITY

Charity Number: 1201265
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Donations are made to benefit charities or charitable purpose. The organisation and staging of an annual fundraising relay race around Cambridge known as "The Chariots of Fire Charity Relay Race" for the benefit of one or two charities chosen as beneficiaries by the Trustees.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £85,019
Total expenditure: £22,114

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 December 2022: CIO registration
  • 17 April 2024: Funds received from 1120534 HARRISON CLARK RICKERBYS CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 27 February 2025: Funds received from 1148113 HCR HEWITSONS CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rachel Gwynne Trustee 16 January 2025
None on record
Gurinder Hayer Trustee 16 January 2025
None on record
Adam Finch Trustee 14 September 2023
None on record
Rachel Roberts Trustee 14 September 2023
None on record
Daniel Joseph Curtis Trustee 07 December 2022
THE ROBERT CLAYTON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE FARNE TRUST
Received: On time
Colin David Jones Trustee 07 December 2022
None on record
Inger Myfanwy Donna Blanca Anson Trustee 07 December 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2024
Total gross income £85.02k
Total expenditure £22.11k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HCR LAW
105 HIGH STREET
WORCESTER
WR1 2HW
Phone:
01905744879
Website:

No information available