BOLDON DOROTHY WALKER TRUST FOR WEST BOLDON GUIDES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GUIDING ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 11 August 1966: Standard registration
- 19 May 2011: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2 | £3 | £3 | £1 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 09 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 27 May 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 06 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 02 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LETTER DATED 10TH SEPTEMBER 1940
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST ONE OR MORE OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATED WITH THE PARISH CHURCH TO ATTEND THE ANNUAL CAMP MEETING OR TO ASSIST WITH A HOLIDAY. IN THE EVENT OF THE GIRL GUIDES CEASING TO BE A PAROCHIAL ORGANISTATION THE INCOME IS TO BE APPLIED FOR THE MORAL AND RELIGIOUS WELFARE OF THE POOR OR BAPTISED CHILDREN OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
WEST BOLDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window