WCCF LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Austria
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Canada
- China
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Hong Kong
- Ireland
- Italy
- Japan
- Netherlands
- Nigeria
- Norway
- Poland
- Portugal
- Scotland
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Taiwan
- Turkey
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
Governance
- 06 September 2023: Standard registration
- WORLD CITIES CULTURE FORUM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeffrey Jacobs | Chair | 16 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Kevin Philip Austin | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Lillianne Janet Halfpenny | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 March 2025 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 DEC 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 SEP 2023
Charitable objects
WCCF'S CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS SET OUT IN ITS ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ARE: 2.1 TO DEVELOP AND IMPROVE THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING, PRACTICE AND SUPPORT OF THE ARTS AND CULTURE IN CITIES WORLDWIDE BY EDUCATING CITY LEADERS AND POLICY MAKERS IN ORDER TO EMPOWER THEM TO ENHANCE CULTURAL INFRASTRUCTURE AND ACCESS TO THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND 2.2 TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND RESEARCH OF THE ROLE THAT ARTS AND CULTURE IN CITIES WORLDWIDE CAN PLAY IN PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT, PROVIDED THAT THE RESULTS AND APPLICATION OF SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Studio Smithfield
1 East Poultry Avenue
LONDON
EC1A 9PT
- Phone:
- 0776433594
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window