Trustees SURFACE AREA DANCE THEATRE

Charity number: 1202467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeffery Martin Dean Chair 23 March 2023
None on record
Joel Daniel Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
Fusako Innami Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
Rachel Boyd Trustee 05 December 2023
None on record
Carol Blythe Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
David Sharp Trustee 02 June 2023
None on record
VALERIE MILNES Trustee 23 March 2023
DIFFERENCE
Received: 11 days late
Elizabeth Louise Pavey Trustee 23 March 2023
None on record