ISLAM AND LIFE IN EUROPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
charity for help
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Iraq
Governance
- 06 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED ALI HUSSEIN | Chair | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Saman mohammed | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ARAM OMAR SAEED | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD JALAL MOHAMMAD | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION AND WORSHIP, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAN AND THE TEACHINGS OF PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PBUH) AS INTERPRETED AND ACCEPTED BY THE AHLE-SUNNAH WAL-JAMAA SCHOOL OF THOUGHT; (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OF ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS A SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL; (3) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG POOR PEOPLE AND OTHER PEOPLE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, WATER AND OTHER NECESSITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 BELVOIR WAY
PETERBOROUGH
PE1 4TE
- Phone:
- 07577768637
- Email:
- saedmahammd@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window