THE FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS SOUTHILL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity makes grants for the repair and maintenance of the historic Grade 2* listed building known as All Saints Southill
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 17 October 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicolaas Johannes Franciskus Rodenburg | Trustee | 05 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Phyllis Mary Dover | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Cain | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan George Peter Dover | Trustee | 05 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN STRUTT | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.77k | £22.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £761 | £4.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05 JUN 2022 AS AMENDED ON 06 OCT 2022
Charitable objects
THE FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS SOUTHILL IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO SUPPORT THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENTS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ALL SAINTS, SOUTHILL, IN THE DIOCESE OF ST ALBANS AND ITS MONUMENTS AND STAINED GLASS IN THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Elgar Drive
SHEFFORD
Bedfordshire
SG17 5RZ
- Phone:
- 01462811927
- Email:
- rodenburg@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window