CHESTERFIELD OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chesterfield Operatic Society (COS) is one of the oldest amateur musical theatre companies in the country, being first established in 1905. Through the presentation of public events and the performance of shows we aim to advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and appreciation of, the dramatic and operatic arts in chesterfield and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 07 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Charles Bennett | Chair | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Melanie Hindle | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Ashall | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karl Simon Brennan-Collis | Trustee | 09 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE ROBERT JOHN KENNING FCA | Trustee | 01 December 1997 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS IN CHESTERFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC EVENTS AND THE PERFORMANCE OF SHOWS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5A ABERCROMBIE STREET
CHESTERFIELD
S41 7LW
- Phone:
- 07881823490
- Website:
-
chesterfieldoperaticsociety.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window