EMPOWER LATAM UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Empower LATAM UK provides programs and events that help young Latin Americans in the UK overcome the barriers they face. This includes: Mentorship Program Skills workshops Networking Events Employer Events One-to-one support Cultural Events and many more. We regularly collaborate with many other organisations, including other charities, companies, local businesses and embassies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Javiera Mora Cortes | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cesar Rodriguez Valido | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Josselyn Elizabeth Quishpi Caz | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andy Jaramillo Jaramillo | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO FAVOUR THE INCLUSION OF YOUNG LATIN AMERICAN PEOPLE LIVING IN THE UK WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED DUE TO THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, CULTURAL BACKGROUND, AND ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL STATUS. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH GROUP OF PEOPLE AND SUPPORT THEIR INTEGRATION AND FULL DEVELOPMENT INTO THE SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES AND CONDUCTING EVENTS TO INCREASE AWARENESS IN AREAS SUCH AS FINANCE, LEGAL, EDUCATIONAL SYSTEM AND LANGUAGE DEVELOPMENT. B) SUPPORTING YOUNG LATIN AMERICAN PEOPLE?S CAREER DEVELOPMENT WITH A MENTORSHIP SCHEME, CAREER-RELATED WORKSHOPS AND NETWORKING OPPORTUNITIES. C) CREATING AN ON-LINE PLATFORM THAT BRINGS TOGETHER THE YOUNG LATIN AMERICAN COMMUNITY IN THE UK WHICH, AMONG OTHER THINGS, SHOWCASES LATIN AMERICAN SUCCESS, BRINGS AWARENESS TO ISSUES IN THE COMMUNITY AND ACTS AS A FORUM AND SAFE SPACE FOR CONVERSATION BETWEEN MEMBERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 BURNHAM STREET
NOTTINGHAM
NG5 2FD
- Phone:
- 07703719083
- Email:
- contact@empowerlatamuk.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window